Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/2005