There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FOCUS Act
Focus On Committed and Underpaid Staff for Children's Sake Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Child Care Provider Development and Retention Grant Program, the Child Care Provider Scholarship Program, and a program of child care provider health benefits coverage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/23/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/20/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/20/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (33)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/16/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/28/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations05/20/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness05/20/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/28/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/23/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2000.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2000. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2005)

Focus On Committed and Underpaid Staff for Children's Sake Act - FOCUS Act - Establishes: (1) the Child Care Provider Development and Retention Grant Program; and (2) the Child Care Provider Scholarship Program.

Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services to allot funds to eligible states (and Indian tribes and tribal organizations) for distribution directly, or at state option through local governments, to pay the federal share of the cost of making grants to eligible child care providers under both such programs.

Healthy Early Education Workforce Grant Program Act - Authorizes the Secretary to allot funds to eligible states (and Indian tribes and tribal organizations) to pay for the federal share of the cost of providing access to affordable health benefits coverage for: (1) eligible child care providers; and (2) at state option, the spouses, domestic partners, and dependents of such providers. Directs the Secretary to conduct an evaluation of several such funded state programs representing various approaches to increasing the rate of coverage for child care providers.