Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/16/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2006