Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/05/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/20/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/20/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 02/08/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/16/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/18/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/27/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/15/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/05/2006