Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/16/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/16/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/07/2005