Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/12/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/19/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/28/2005