Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/10/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/19/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/31/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/13/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2006