There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to undertake a program to reduce the risks from and mitigate the effects of avalanches on recreational users of public land.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/28/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
07/27/2006Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health
05/19/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/11/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/11/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/29/2006

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources04/28/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands05/11/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health05/11/2005 Referred to
07/27/2006 Hearings by
House Agriculture04/28/2005 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Dairy, Nutrition, and Forestry05/19/2005 Referred to
House Government Reform04/28/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2039. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2005)

Federal Land Recreational Visitor Protection Act of 2005 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to establish an avalanche protection program to: (1) provide early identification of the potential for avalanches that could endanger the safety of recreational users of public land and visitors to units of the National Park System (NPS); and (2) reduce the risks and mitigate the effects of avalanches on visitors, recreational users, neighboring communities, and transportation corridors.

Requires the Secretary and the Secretary of Agriculture to: (1) use the resources of the National Avalanche Center of the Forest Service to carry out this Act; and (2) establish an advisory committee to assist in the development and implementation of the program.

Directs such Secretaries and the Secretary of the Army to establish a central depository for weapons, ammunition, and parts for avalanche control purposes, including an inventory that can be made available to Federal and non-Federal entities.

Authorizes the Secretaries of Interior and Agriculture to make grants to carry out projects and activities under the program to: (1) assist in the prevention, forecasting, detection, and mitigation of avalanches; (2) maintain essential transportation and communications; (3) assist avalanche artillery users to ensure the availability of adequate supplies of artillery and other explosives required for avalanche control in or affecting NPS units, other Federal land used for recreation, and adjacent communities, and essential transportation corridors; and (4) assist research and development activities for alternatives to minimize reliance on military weapons for avalanche control.