Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/03/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2006