Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/18/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/24/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/24/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/02/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/15/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/15/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/18/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/18/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/14/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/22/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew