Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2006