Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/03/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/18/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/24/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/07/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/07/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/24/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/21/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/06/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/07/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/25/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/15/2006