Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/12/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/26/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/22/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/21/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/21/2005