Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/27/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/19/2006