Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/25/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/15/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/15/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/22/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/22/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/20/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/28/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/28/2006