Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/04/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2005