Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/18/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/18/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/25/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/02/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/02/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/04/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/19/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/21/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/2006