Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/24/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/24/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/28/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/08/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/15/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/15/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/08/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/29/2006