Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/06/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/27/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/03/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/03/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/17/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/06/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/11/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/12/2006