Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/20/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/24/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/12/2006