Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/25/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/21/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/06/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/26/2006