Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/06/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 01/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/06/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/25/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/25/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/25/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/09/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/02/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/02/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/12/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/12/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/12/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/12/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/13/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/19/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/19/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/04/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/12/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/16/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/16/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/26/2005