Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/08/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/07/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/07/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/15/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/15/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/15/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/15/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/14/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/11/2006