Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/26/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/26/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/01/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/29/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/12/2006