Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/11/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/23/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/15/2005