Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/14/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/10/2006