Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/02/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/08/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew