There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Andrew Carnegie Public Libraries Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for public library construction and modernization.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/31/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/31/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/11/2005Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/28/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/11/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections05/31/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Select Education05/31/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2292.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/11/2005)

Andrew Carnegie Public Libraries Act - Amends the Library Services and Technology Act to authorize the Director of the Institute of Museum and Library Services to make grants for the construction or modernization of public libraries.

Sets forth application requirements for persons or entities desiring to receive such grants. Allows the non-federal share of project costs to be provided from state, local, or private sources, including for-profit and nonprofit organizations. Provides for recovery of funds if a grant recipient or successor ceases or fails to be a public or nonprofit institution, or if the facility ceases to be used as a library.