Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/19/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/23/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/09/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/09/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/17/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/20/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/20/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/22/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/21/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/02/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/02/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/05/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/02/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/13/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/05/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew