Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/18/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/19/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/19/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/23/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/23/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/23/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/24/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/26/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/26/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/21/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/30/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/22/2005