Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/12/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/26/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/31/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/31/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/31/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/25/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2006