Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/16/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/19/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/04/2005