Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/01/2005