Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/21/2005