Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/29/2006