Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/24/2005