Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/12/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/13/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/22/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/27/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/08/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew