Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/24/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/24/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/24/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/26/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/27/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/27/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/27/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/15/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/15/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/20/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/20/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/04/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/04/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/20/2006