Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/07/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/07/2005