Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/24/2005