Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/28/2005