Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/20/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/01/2006