Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/18/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/19/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/24/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/25/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/25/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/07/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/21/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/23/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/29/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/15/2006