Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/13/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/06/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/28/2006