Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/13/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/06/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/09/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/28/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/04/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/18/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/28/2006