Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/30/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/30/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/27/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/27/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/27/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/07/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/22/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/22/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/20/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/20/2006