Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/26/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/06/2006