There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

International Solid Waste Importation and Management Act of 2006

Short Titles as Reported to House

International Solid Waste Importation and Management Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

International Solid Waste Importation and Management Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to authorize States to restrict receipt of foreign municipal solid waste and implement the Agreement Concerning the Transboundary Movement of Hazardous Waste between the United States and Canada, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/06/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6254-6255)
09/27/2005Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-235.
05/19/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/07/2006SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/06/2006-3:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/06/2006-3:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6254-6255)
09/06/2006-3:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2491.
09/06/2006-3:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6254-6259)
09/06/2006-3:08pmHouseMr. Gillmor moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/27/2005HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
09/27/2005HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-235.
06/29/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/29/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/08/2005HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials
06/08/2005HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials
06/03/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/19/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/19/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/19/2005 Referred to
06/29/2005 Markup by
09/27/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-235
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials06/03/2005 Referred to
06/08/2005 Markup by
06/08/2005 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works09/07/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2491. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/06/2006)

International Solid Waste Importation and Management Act of 2006 - Amends the Solid Waste Disposal Act to authorize states to enact laws or issue regulations or orders restricting the receipt and disposal of foreign municipal solid waste, as defined by this Act, within their borders until the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) issues regulations implementing and enforcing the Agreement Concerning the Transboundary Movement of Hazardous Waste between the United States and Canada (Agreement). Declares that state actions authorized by this Act shall not be considered a burden on, or otherwise impede, interstate and foreign commerce.

Requires the Administrator to: (1) perform the functions of the Designated Authority of the United States with respect to the importation and exportation of municipal solid waste under the Agreement; (2) implement and enforce the notice and consent and other provisions of the Agreement; and (3) issue final regulations on the Administrator's responsibilities as Designated Authority of the United States.

Requires the Administrator to give substantial weight to the views of affected states and local governments before consenting to the importation of foreign municipal solid waste into the United States under the Agreement, and to consider the impact of such importation on: (1) the continued public support for state and local recycling programs; (2) landfill capacities; (3) air emissions and road deterioration from increased vehicular traffic; and (4) homeland security, public health, and the environment.

Makes it unlawful for any person to import, transport, or export municipal solid waste for final disposal or for incineration in violation of the Agreement.

Authorizes the Administrator to assess civil penalties for any past or current violations of this Act or to commence a civil action in the U.S. district court. Limits the amount of such civil penalties to $25,000 per day of noncompliance for each violation. Provides for a public hearing to review any noncompliance order issued by the Administrator.