There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the tax incentives for the use of biodiesel through 2010.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/19/2005Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/09/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/21/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/24/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/19/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/19/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2498. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/2005)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through December 31, 2010, the income tax credit for biodiesel used as fuel and the excise credits for biodiesel mixtures and biodiesel used to produce biodiesel mixtures.