Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/02/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/01/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/01/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/01/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/01/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/01/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/26/2006